U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00526
  • Case Name: Gallion v. Migliori et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 14, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 12, 2018: [Return Mail]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 28, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 28, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 28, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.