U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00530
  • Case Name: Hepburn v. Boston Scientific Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 01, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Litigation Order]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 28, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 29, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.