U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00531
  • Case Name: Abell v. United States Department of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Strike]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • May 01, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 01, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 01, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • May 01, 2020: [In Limine]
  • May 01, 2020: [Witness List]
  • May 01, 2020: [Exhibit List]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2019: [Strike]
  • March 08, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Declaration]
  • February 28, 2019: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2019: [Statement]
  • February 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 26, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 31, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 31, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 09, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 09, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 06, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 01, 2018: [More Definite Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 02, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.