U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00312
  • Case Name: Howarth v. Boundary Community Hospital et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 28, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 18, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 18, 2018: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • May 14, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 09, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [In Limine]
  • April 20, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 20, 2018: [Objection]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 13, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • April 13, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 13, 2018: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • April 13, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 13, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 12, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.