U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Pizarro v. City of Boise
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Return Mail]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 03, 2018: [Return Mail]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Return Mail]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 17, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 05, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.