U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Seidita v. Global Receivables Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 03, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 08, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 08, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 01, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Errata]
  • January 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.