U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Meyers v. Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 23, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 27, 2018: [Consent Filed]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2018: [Compel]
  • January 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.