U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Nampa Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 17, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 05, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.