U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00009
  • Case Name: J.V. v. Kuna School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 02, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Quash]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Seal]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 22, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 09, 2018: [Receipt]
  • January 08, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 08, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • January 08, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.