U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Paddock v. Ballou et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2018: [Response (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 09, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • February 27, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 01, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Receipt]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.