U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Cox v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Return Mail]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • March 07, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Service]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 09, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.