U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Donahue et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 26, 2019: [Seal]
  • February 26, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 18, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 10, 2018: [Errata]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 26, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • January 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.