U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Baker v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 05, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Receipt]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 10, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 10, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.