U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Adamcik v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Supplement]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • November 12, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.