U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 01, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 22, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • May 22, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 11, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 11, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.