U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Harris v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Request]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.