U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Estate of Steven R. Pitts et al v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order]
  • February 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 16, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.