U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Gardner v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 20, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 31, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 17, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.