U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Jensen Jewelers of Idaho, LLC v. Zale Delaware, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 17, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 17, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Contempt Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 09, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • January 18, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.