U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00021
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bezates et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Judgment - Consent]
  • July 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • May 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.