U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Bridwell v. KWA Property Management, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 16, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 20, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 07, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 28, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 09, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 18, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.