U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Clyne v. Page
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Reopening Case]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 21, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Stay]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 19, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 19, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.