U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00027
  • Case Name: He et al v. Muroff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 22, 2020: [Intervene]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.