U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Padilla-Arredondo v. Donahue et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Status Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 23, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 08, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 24, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 23, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 24, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 24, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.