U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Berkey-Silvers v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.