U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Engstrom et al v. Wells
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 21, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 15, 2018: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • March 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 24, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.