U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Kubat v. Paige
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 30, 2018: [Receipt]
  • August 06, 2018: [Response (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • March 20, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Consent Filed]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 24, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.