U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Williams v. Stewart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 15, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [Supplement]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 24, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 24, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.