U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Gemini Technologies, Incorporated v. Smith & Wesson, Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2020: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 05, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Consents (All are in)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2019: [Counterclaim]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 21, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 21, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.