U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Norvell v. DePuy Orthopaedics Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 13, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order CTO]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.