U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Melaleuca, Inc. v. Shan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 12, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: [Stay]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Stay]
  • March 19, 2019: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • March 15, 2019: [Status Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Status Report]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 24, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 24, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Stay]
  • May 08, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 04, 2018: [Reconsideration]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 03, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 07, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 06, 2018: [Statement]
  • March 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 26, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 19, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Errata]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • February 07, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 05, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2018: [Expedite]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 30, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 26, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.