U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Hollingsworth v. PJ Holdings KY, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Certify Class]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 25, 2018: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.