U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Callister v. Owen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 23, 2020: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • January 23, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 23, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
  • June 01, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 13, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • April 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Status Report]
  • February 06, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Summons Reissued]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 29, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.