U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Seegmiller v. United State Department of Agriculture
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 29, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 23, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 23, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 27, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 24, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 07, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 29, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.