U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Resler et al v. United States Trustee, Boise
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Court's Certificate of Service]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • July 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2018: [Appellees Brief]
  • July 06, 2018: [Excerpt of Record]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Excerpt of Record]
  • May 04, 2018: [Appellants Brief]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Designations of Record]
  • February 08, 2018: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • February 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Designations of Record]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • January 30, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.