U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Ocampo v. Corizon LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 12, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 12, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 10, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2019: [Strike]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 31, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 31, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 20, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Receipt]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Bond]
  • November 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 22, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 17, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 11, 2018: [Strike]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 10, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 28, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 30, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
  • April 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.