U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00048
  • Case Name: CMoore Holdings, LLC v. Five Mile Estates Subdivisions
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 04, 2019: [Declaration]
  • January 04, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.