U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Bryant v. Fletcher
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 15, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 15, 2018: [Consent Filed]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 03, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2018: [Counterclaim]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.