U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League v. U.S. Forest Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 01, 2020: [Stipulation]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 10, 2020: [Appeal Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Request]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 23, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 26, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 18, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • June 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 11, 2018: [Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Stay]
  • April 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2018: [Intervene]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 28, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 28, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.