U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Bernard v. White et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2018: [Vacate]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.