U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Verity Property Management, Inc. et al v. The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 21, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 21, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 02, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 01, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.