U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Moss v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 05, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2018: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
  • February 01, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.