U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Bergman v. Matt's Custom Meats et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 17, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 16, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 16, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 15, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 13, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 27, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.