U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00521
  • Case Name: P. R. et al v. Shoshone School District No. 321 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2019: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • March 26, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • March 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [In Limine]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 21, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 20, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 19, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Protective Order]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 07, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 24, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 24, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 24, 2018: [Errata]
  • August 24, 2018: [Sealed Document]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • July 27, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • July 26, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • July 24, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 24, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 12, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 28, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 27, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Protective Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.