U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Suko et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 22, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 06, 2018: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • February 06, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 06, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.