U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Wrede v. IDOC, Acting Director Henry Atencio and Sheriff Craig Rowland
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Return Mail]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2018: [Request]
  • February 07, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 07, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 07, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.