U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Burke v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • May 30, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 12, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 09, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 08, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 08, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.