U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Edmo v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 12, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Receipt]
  • February 09, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.