U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Connell et al v. McClure et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2018: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.