U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Mendez v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 07, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 20, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.